Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Bélik

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1757³Born
11 Feb 178123.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Mar 178123.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Oct 182365.8SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
24 Nov 182365.9ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
28 Mar 182466.3Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
2 May 182466.4InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
5 Mar 184789.2DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for József Bélik
Bishop József Bélik (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDezsér

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 336
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,790
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast