Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ildefonso Maria Sansierra Robla, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1910Born
19 Sep 193626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Mar 196251.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
5 Mar 196251.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
13 May 196252.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreus
28 Apr 196656.1AppointedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
2 Jun 196656.2InstalledArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
12 May 198070.1DiedArchbishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ildefonso Maria Sansierra Robla
Archbishop Ildefonso Maria Sansierra Robla O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorrea

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast