Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victorio Manuel Bonamín, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Military

Titular Bishop of Bita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1909BornRosario
7 Jul 193525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jan 196050.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Argentina, Military
27 Jan 196050.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
27 Jan 196050.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Mar 196050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
22 Apr 197565.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Mar 198272.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Argentina, Military
11 Nov 199182.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Military

MicroData Summary for Victorio Manuel Bonamín:
Bishop Victorio Manuel Bonamín S.D.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Military

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013