Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bruno Wolnik, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Lusaka, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1882Born
17 Oct 192745.0AppointedPrefect of Broken Hill, Zambia
195067.2ResignedPrefect of Lusaka, Zambia
7 Sep 196077.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Lusaka, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Bruno Wolnik
Father Bruno Wolnik S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Lusaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBieńkowice, Poland

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast