Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Dapaong

Dioecesis Dapaonganus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 3 December 1990
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lomé
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Togo
  • Square Kilometers: 8,533 (3,295 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 61, Dapaong, Togo
  • Telephone: 770.80.37
  • Fax: 770.81.83

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Dapango
1 March 1960ErectedDiocese of Sokodé Prefecture Apostolic of Dapango (erected)
Diocese of Dapango
6 July 1965ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Dapango Diocese of Dapango
Diocese of Dapaong
3 December 1990Name ChangedDiocese of Dapango Diocese of Dapaong

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Dapango
19705,429280,8531.9%141438717305ap1971
19809,200333,0002.8%62430306323513ap1981
Diocese of Dapaong
199016,500442,0003.7%153146358525010ap1991
199933,709542,9146.2%122335963566613ap2000
200035,577560,6336.3%172037961526813ap2001
200138,174590,1876.5%1522371,031537113ap2002
200235,819590,1876.1%827351,023637113ap2003
200325,233593,5984.3%142842600607013ap2004
2004147,716597,18024.7%1621373,992477014ap2005
200641,746599,0007.0%241842993476914ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011