Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Yang Shao-huai (Xiaohuai), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hankow [Hankou], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1915Born
1 Jan 194529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Jan 198468.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
10 Dec 199883.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hankow [Hankou], China

MicroData Summary for Anthony Yang Shao-huai (Xiaohuai)
Bishop Anthony Yang Shao-huai (Xiaohuai) O.F.M. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hankow [Hankou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXiaogan County

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast