Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odoric Victor Liu Hede (Liu Ho-teh), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hankow [Hankou], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1912Born
1929²16.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
1 Feb 193623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
1950²37.0SelectedAdministrator of Hankow [Hankou], China
18 Jan 198471.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China
10 Dec 200189.0DiedBishop of Hankow [Hankou], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Odoric Victor Liu Hede (Liu Ho-teh)
Bishop Odoric Victor Liu Hede (Liu Ho-teh) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Hankow [Hankou]

EventPlace
Death PlaceWuhan

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast