Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortunato Maria Farina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foggia

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1881BornBaronissi
18 Sep 190423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy
21 Jun 191938.3AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
10 Aug 191938.4Ordained BishopBishop of Troia, Italy
18 Dec 192443.8AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
15 May 195170.2ResignedBishop of Troia, Italy
1 Feb 195472.9ResignedBishop of Foggia, Italy
1 Feb 195472.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
20 Feb 195472.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Foggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Maria Farina:
Archbishop Fortunato Maria Farina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foggia

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013