Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Vincenzo Ricotta

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1851Born
20 Dec 187322.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189645.1AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
5 Jul 189645.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
14 Jan 190957.7DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Vincenzo Ricotta
Bishop Carlo Vincenzo Ricotta (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoggia, Diocese of Foggia
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Ges¨ a Castro Pretorio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 365
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1896, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017