Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antônio dos Reis

Deceased

Bishop of Cuiabá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1798BornSão Paulo
7 Apr 182122.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 183233.6SelectedBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
2 Jul 183234.1ConfirmedBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
8 Dec 183234.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
11 Oct 187678.3DiedBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Antônio dos Reis:
Bishop José Antônio dos Reis (born , died ) Bishop of Cuiabá

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013