Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyrillo de Paula Freitas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul

Titular Bishop of Antipatris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1860BornCapelinha
30 May 188525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Brazil
27 Mar 190545.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
27 Mar 190545.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
7 Jan 190645.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
13 Mar 191151.0AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
3 May 191151.1InstalledBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
8 Feb 191857.9ResignedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
8 Feb 191857.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
9 Mar 194787.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cyrillo de Paula Freitas:
Bishop Cyrillo de Paula Freitas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corumbá

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 59
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013