Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rondonópolis

Dioecesis Rondonopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Juventino Kestering, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 February 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cuiabá
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Mato Grosso
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 51,000 (19,698 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Oeste 2
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 150, Av. Frei Servacio 393, 78700-970 Rondonopolis, MT, Brazil
  • Telephone: (066)3426-6757
  • Fax: 3426-7606

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Chapada
13 July 1940ErectedArchdiocese of Cuiabá Territorial Prelature of Chapada (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Rondonópolis
25 November 1961Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Chapada Territorial Prelature of Rondonópolis
Diocese of Rondonópolis
15 February 1986ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Rondonópolis Diocese of Rondonópolis
23 December 1997Territory LostDiocese of Barra do Garças
Diocese of Rondonópolis
Diocese of Sinop
Territorial Prelature of Paranatinga (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Chapada
195035,00037,00094.6%557,0007162ap1951
Territorial Prelature of Rondonópolis
196610,000100,00010.0%28101,00015356ap1967
1970160,000175,00091.4%127198,4211126210ap1971
1976105,000150,00070.0%95147,5001106010ap1977
1980175,000229,00076.4%1061610,93785411ap1981
Diocese of Rondonópolis
1990229,000270,00084.8%1013239,956195214ap1991
1999240,000270,00088.9%1810288,5711195115ap2000
2000245,000280,00087.5%1610269,4231124915ap2001
2001240,000275,00087.3%178259,6001175115ap2002
2002240,000275,00087.3%178259,600194715ap2003
2003242,000278,00087.1%208288,6421164615ap2004
2004237,000275,00086.2%1582310,3041104715ap2005
2010238,000291,00081.8%206269,1532164615ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 15 Feb 2012