Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Maria de Macerata, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Cuiabá, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1779Born
23 Aug 182344.0AppointedPrelate of Cuiabá, Brazil
15 Jul 182646.8AppointedBishop of Cuiabá, Brazil
1831²51.3ResignedBishop-Elect of Cuiabá, Brazil
1845²65.3DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Cuiabá, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Maria de Macerata
Father José Maria de Macerata O.F.M. Cap. (born , died 1845) Former Bishop-Elect of Cuiabá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacerata, Italy

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast