Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas (Tomy) Joseph Tharayil

Auxiliary Bishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India

Titular Bishop of Agrippias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1972 Born
1 Jan 200027.9Ordained PriestPriest of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
14 Jan 201744.9ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar), India
14 Jan 201744.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Agrippias
23 Apr 201745.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agrippias

MicroData Summary for Thomas (Tomy) Joseph Tharayil (VIAF: 288249427)
Bishop Thomas (Tomy) Joseph Tharayil (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Changanacherry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChanganacherry, Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Changanacherry, Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2017
  • c1: CB, 14 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 29 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 24 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017