Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Kurialachery

Deceased

Bishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1873BornKalluread
27 May 189926.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 191138.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
30 Aug 191138.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
3 Dec 191138.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
15 Dec 191138.9InstalledVicar Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
21 Dec 192350.9AppointedBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
2 Jun 192552.4DiedBishop of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Kurialachery:
Bishop Thomas Kurialachery (born , died ) Bishop of Changanacherry

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013