Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gbaya Boniface Ziri

Bishop of Abengourou


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1949 BornGagnoa
6 Jun 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
199444.0IncardinatedPriest of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
1 Jul 200959.5AppointedBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Aug 200959.6Ordained BishopBishop of Abengourou, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Gbaya Boniface Ziri:
Bishop Gbaya Boniface Ziri (born ) Bishop of Abengourou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Abengourou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,260
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015