Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Zhang Yinlin

Bishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Anyang)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1971 Born
17 Aug 199625.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 201544.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China
4 Aug 201544.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China
8 May 201645.1SucceededBishop of Jixian [Weihwei], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhang Yinlin
Bishop Joseph Zhang Yinlin (born ) Bishop of Jixian [Weihwei]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinzhou city
Ordained BishopAnyang, Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jixian [Weihwei].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast