Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Xuzhou [Süchow]

Dioecesis Siuceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 20,000 (7,725 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Xuzhou, Jiangsu, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Süchow
1 July 1931ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Süchow (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Süchow [Xuzhou]
18 June 1935ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Süchow Vicariate Apostolic of Süchow [Xuzhou]
Diocese of Xuzhou [Süchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Süchow [Xuzhou] Diocese of Xuzhou [Süchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Xuzhou [Süchow]
195093,5004,500,0002.1%1435491,908214533ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012