Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
Apr 1970³ | Born | ||
15 Jun 1995 | 25.2 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
2009² | 38.7 | Selected | Coadjutor Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China |
15 Nov 2010 | 40.6 | Ordained Bishop | Coadjutor Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China |
8 Feb 2013 | 42.8 | Succeeded | Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China |
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Boxing county |
Ordained Bishop | Sacred Heart of Jesus, Cathedral, Zhouncun, Diocese of Zhoucun [Chowtsun] |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠