Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Wang Renlei

Bishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1970 Born
10 Aug 199626.1Ordained PriestPriest
2006²35.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China
30 Nov 200636.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China
18 May 201140.9SucceededBishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China
2012²41.5ConfirmedBishop of Xuzhou [Süchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Wang Renlei
Bishop John Wang Renlei (born ) Bishop of Xuzhou [Süchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeishan/Shandong
Ordained BishopXuzhou

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xuzhou [Süchow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast