Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Fan Xueyan

Deceased

Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1907Born
22 Dec 193426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
12 Apr 195143.2AppointedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
24 Jun 195143.4Ordained BishopBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
16 Apr 199284.2DiedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Fan Xueyan
Bishop Peter Joseph Fan Xueyan (born , died ) Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiao Wang Ting, Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]
Ordained BishopHankow, Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]
Death PlacePrison, Cheng-teh City

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,909
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1951, Number 58
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 May 2020

Quantcast