Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Jia Zhiguo (Kia Zhi Cuo, Jia Shoushen)

Deceased

Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1934Born
7 Jun 198046.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 198046.5Ordained BishopBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China

MicroData Summary for Julius Jia Zhiguo (Kia Zhi Cuo, Jia Shoushen)
Bishop Julius Jia Zhiguo (Kia Zhi Cuo, Jia Shoushen) (born ) Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting]

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast