Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Ferro

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
3 Dec 162932.9AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
16 Dec 162932.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
Jul 1635³38.5DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ferro
Bishop Domenico Ferro (born 1597, died Jul 1635) Bishop of San Severo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampi Marani
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 313
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 15
  • c34: AT, 12 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,989

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast