Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Francesco Passionei

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Dec 1629AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
16 Dec 1629Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
27 Nov 1641AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
Aug 1657³DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Passionei:
Bishop Giovanni Francesco Passionei , Bishop of Pesaro

  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281, and Page 129
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 3 Mar 2015