Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Gaspare Melis

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
16 Sep 162645.7AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
11 Oct 162645.7Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
Jan 1642³61.0DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gian Gaspare Melis
Bishop Gian Gaspare Melis (born 1581, died Jan 1642) Bishop of Anagni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Vittoria in Matenano, Diocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Valle, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Anagni, Diocese of Anagni

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 41
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 8 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Mar 2019

Quantcast