Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Crinò (Curio, Zurio)

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1629AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
16 Dec 1629Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
1633¹DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Crinò (Curio, Zurio)
Bishop Filippo Crinò (Curio, Zurio) (died 1633) Bishop of Belcastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: AT, 12 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,988

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast