Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín de León Cárdenas, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornArchidona, Spain
13 May 163045.3AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
20 May 163045.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
7 Apr 163146.2AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
27 Aug 165065.6AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Nov 165570.8DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martín de León Cárdenas:
Archbishop Martín de León Cárdenas O.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 345, and Page 272
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 289
  • bd/bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 152, Number 967
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015