Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Marie Jean Denis You

Bishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1955 Born
23 Jul 198126.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 200247.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
11 Dec 200247.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
10 Feb 200347.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia
8 Feb 200650.5AppointedBishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Dominique Marie Jean Denis You
Bishop Dominique Marie Jean Denis You (born ) Bishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGassin, France

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast