Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Brian Mascord

Bishop-Elect of Wollongong, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1959 Born
31 Oct 199233.7Ordained PriestPriest of Maitland, Australia
30 Nov 201758.8AppointedBishop of Wollongong, Australia
22 Feb 201859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wollongong, Australia

MicroData Summary for Brian Mascord
Father Brian Mascord (born ) Bishop-Elect of Wollongong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewcastle, Diocese of Maitland
Ordained BishopWIN Entertainment Centre, Wollongong, Diocese of Wollongong

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Wollongong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 14 Dec 2017
  • c2+: CB, 7 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2018