Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop John Li Xi-ting (Li Hsi Ying)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1909²Born
1938²29.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 195748.9SelectedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
6 Jul 195849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
28 May 198980.4DiedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Li Xi-ting (Li Hsi Ying)
Bishop John Li Xi-ting (Li Hsi Ying) (born 1909, died ) Bishop of Chengdu [Chengtu]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChengtu, Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,057

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast