Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Duan Yinmin (Duan In-min)

Deceased

Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1908Born
27 Mar 193729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China
9 Jun 194941.2AppointedBishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China
18 Oct 194941.6Ordained BishopBishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China
10 Jan 200192.8DiedBishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China

MicroData Summary for Matthias Duan Yinmin (Duan In-min)
Bishop Matthias Duan Yinmin (Duan In-min) (born , died ) Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMutewche
Ordained BishopWanhsien, Diocese of Wanxian [Wanhsien]
Death PlaceWanhsien, Diocese of Wanxian [Wanhsien]

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 51.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,949, Number 98
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast