Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Marie-Joseph-Hubert-Ghislain de Jonghe d’Ardoye, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

Titular Archbishop of Misthia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1887BornSaint-Gilles-lès-Bruxelles, Belgium
21 Jun 191023.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 May 193346.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
23 May 193346.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yünnanfu, China
17 Sep 193346.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amathus in Cypro
17 Oct 193851.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Misthia
17 Oct 193851.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Iraq
6 Jul 194760.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Indonesia
16 Mar 195062.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Indonesia
2 Mar 195567.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
23 Nov 195669.5ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
27 Aug 196174.3DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Egypt, Arab Republic of

MicroData Summary for Georges-Marie-Joseph-Hubert-Ghislain de Jonghe d’Ardoye:
Archbishop Georges-Marie-Joseph-Hubert-Ghislain de Jonghe d’Ardoye M.E.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Egypt, Arab Republic of

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015