Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Maria Wainaina Kungu

Bishop of Muranga, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1956 Born
13 Dec 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Nyeri, Kenya
5 Dec 200245.9IncardinatedPriest of Nyahururu, Kenya
4 Apr 200952.2AppointedBishop of Muranga, Kenya
27 Jun 200952.5Ordained BishopBishop of Muranga, Kenya

MicroData Summary for James Maria Wainaina Kungu
Bishop James Maria Wainaina Kungu (born ) Bishop of Muranga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNgenya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Muranga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast