Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Robert van Velde de Melroy et Sart-Bomal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1743Born
18 Feb 176925.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Sep 176926.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 179350.3SelectedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
21 Feb 179450.6ConfirmedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
17 Aug 179451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
24 Nov 180158.3ResignedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
22 Jan 182480.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Robert van Velde de Melroy et Sart-Bomal
Bishop Jean Baptiste Robert van Velde de Melroy et Sart-Bomal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruselles

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1796
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 361
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,504
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast