Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Chambre d’Urgons

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Titular Bishop of Oropus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1748Born
17 Dec 178739.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
17 Dec 178739.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Oropus
3 Feb 178839.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oropus
5 Oct 181971.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Chambre d’Urgons
Bishop Henri de Chambre d’Urgons (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTartas Landes

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 319, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast