Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Kámánházy

Deceased

Bishop of Vác, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1753Born
5 Jun 177522.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Sep 177522.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 180854.9SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
11 Jul 180855.1ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
28 Aug 180855.3Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
4 Feb 181763.7DiedBishop of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Kámánházy
Bishop László Kámánházy (born , died ) Bishop of Vác

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNitra

  • a priest for 41.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 17
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 386

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast