Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Stillemans

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1832BornSaint Nicolas
20 Sep 185623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
30 Dec 188957.1AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Jan 189057.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
9 Nov 191683.9DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Antoine Stillemans:
Bishop Antoine Stillemans (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 282
  • d: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 8, Page 464
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014