Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Louis Antoine Leys, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kivu

Titular Bishop of Uzalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1889BornBruges, Belgium
27 Jun 191424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
19 Dec 192940.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kivu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Dec 192940.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
21 Apr 193040.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
Aug 1944³55.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kivu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
10 Aug 194556.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kivu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edouard Louis Antoine Leys:
Bishop Edouard Louis Antoine Leys M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kivu

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015