Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émile-Jean Seghers

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1855BornGand
21 Sep 187823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
22 Mar 191761.5AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
1 May 191761.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 May 192771.7DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Émile-Jean Seghers:
Bishop Émile-Jean Seghers (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015