Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Štefan Vrablec

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia

Titular Bishop of Thasbalta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1925Born
23 Dec 195025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trnava, Slovakia
19 Jun 199873.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
19 Jun 199873.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
26 Jul 199873.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
2 Apr 200479.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia
1 Sep 201792.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bratislava-Trnava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Štefan Vrablec (VIAF: 85459753)
Bishop Štefan Vrablec (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bratislava-Trnava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZávod
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame des Sept Douleurs, Basilica, Sastin
Death PlaceNitra, Diocese of Nitra

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,362
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast