Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Wolfgang Demont, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Usinaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1880Born
25 Apr 190524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
27 Jul 192342.6AppointedPrefect of Gariep, South Africa
27 Jan 193655.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Usinaza
27 Jan 193655.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aliwal, South Africa
22 Mar 193655.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Usinaza
3 Feb 194463.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Aliwal, South Africa
15 Jun 196483.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aliwal, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Franz Wolfgang Demont
Bishop Franz Wolfgang Demont S.C.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Aliwal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurtscheid, Germany

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast