Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Rosales Dean

Archbishop Emeritus of Palo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1930 Born
30 Nov 195626.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 197747.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Davao, Philippines
12 Dec 197747.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
25 Jan 197847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
23 Jul 198050.4AppointedPrelate of Tagum, Philippines
11 Oct 198050.6AppointedBishop of Tagum, Philippines
12 Oct 198555.6AppointedArchbishop of Palo, Philippines
18 Mar 200676.0RetiredArchbishop of Palo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rosales Dean
Archbishop Pedro Rosales Dean (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Palo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalbayog
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Manilla, Archdiocese of Manila

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Palo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2006
  • c1: CB, 28 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Apr 2021

Quantcast