Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Varga

Bishop of Kaposvár, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1956 Born
17 Apr 198225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Veszprém, Hungary
31 May 199336.7IncardinatedPriest of Kaposvár, Hungary
25 Mar 201760.6AppointedBishop of Kaposvár, Hungary
13 May 201760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kaposvár, Hungary

MicroData Summary for László Varga
Bishop László Varga (born ) Bishop of Kaposvár

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTapolca, Archdiocese of Veszprém

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaposvár.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2017
  • c2+: CB, 3 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 May 2017