Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Libardo Ramírez Gómez

Bishop Emeritus of Garzón, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1933 Born
26 May 195622.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 197238.2AppointedBishop of Armenia, Colombia
8 Apr 197238.4Ordained BishopBishop of Armenia, Colombia
18 Oct 198652.9AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
15 Mar 200369.3ResignedBishop of Garzón, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Libardo Ramírez Gómez
Bishop Libardo Ramírez Gómez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Garzón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarzón
Ordained BishopCathedral, Garzón, Diocese of Garzón

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garzón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast