Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernando Rojas Ramirez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Neiva, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1924Born
15 Jun 194722.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 197247.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Espinal, Colombia
26 Apr 197247.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Auca
15 Jun 197247.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auca
12 Dec 197450.0SucceededBishop of Espinal, Colombia
1 Jul 198560.5AppointedBishop of Neiva, Colombia
19 Jan 200176.1RetiredBishop of Neiva, Colombia
13 Feb 200277.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Neiva, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hernando Rojas Ramirez
Bishop Hernando Rojas Ramirez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Neiva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChoconta

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast