Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús López y González

Deceased

Bishop of Aguascalientes, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1872Born
30 Nov 189725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
1 Jul 192754.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aguascalientes, México
1 Jul 192754.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dadima
30 Mar 192855.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dadima
20 Sep 192956.9AppointedBishop of Aguascalientes, México
2 Jan 193057.2InstalledBishop of Aguascalientes, México
11 Nov 195078.0DiedBishop of Aguascalientes, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús López y González (VIAF: 4606046)
Bishop José de Jesús López y González (born , died ) Bishop of Aguascalientes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguascalientes

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast