Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcel Roger Buyse, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lahore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1892BornIzegem, Belgium
20 May 191724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Jun 194754.8AppointedBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
28 Oct 194755.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
12 Mar 196774.6RetiredBishop of Lahore, Pakistan
12 Mar 196774.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
8 Jan 197178.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
29 May 197481.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Lahore, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Marcel Roger Buyse:
Bishop Marcel Roger Buyse O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lahore

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013