Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Torasso, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Florencia

Titular Bishop of Thapsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1914BornVerolengo, Italy
10 Mar 194025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
10 Jan 195237.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Florencia, Colombia
10 Jan 195237.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
20 Apr 195237.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thapsus
22 Oct 196045.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Florencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Torasso:
Bishop Antonio Torasso I.M.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Florencia

  • a priest for 20.6 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013