Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prefecture Apostolic of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk

Apostolica Praefectura Sachaliniana Meridionalis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Prefecture Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 10 April 2002
  • Prefecture
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Russian Federation
  • Square Kilometers: 87,100 (33,642 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: ul. Griboyedova 110, P.O. Box 4, 664074 Irkutsk, Russia
  • Telephone: (3952)41.03.10
  • Fax: 41.01.14

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Karafuto
18 July 1932ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Sapporo Mission "Sui Iuris" of Karafuto (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Karafuto
21 May 1938ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Karafuto Prefecture Apostolic of Karafuto
Prefecture Apostolic of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk
10 April 2002Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Karafuto Prefecture Apostolic of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Karafuto
20012,000515,000.4%221,0001ap2002
Prefecture Apostolic of Yuzhno Sakhalinsk
20022,015515,000.4%112,01518ap2003
20032,050515,000.4%221,025247ap2004
20042,100515,000.4%221,05027ap2005
20101,000546,700.2%225002ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011