Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angel Araújo Iglesias

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo-Ferrol


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1920BornPaderrubia
25 Jul 194525.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 197050.4AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
6 Sep 197050.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
20 May 198565.3ResignedBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
22 Jul 200787.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angel Araújo Iglesias:
Bishop Miguel Angel Araújo Iglesias (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo-Ferrol

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015